THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:25:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Van Aarsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Aarsen (CPSO#: 101112 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Marcus Van Aarsen Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Van Aarsen (CPSO#: 101112 )
Business Address: LHSC Victoria Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS JAMES VAN AARSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN AARSEN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARCUS JAMES VAN AARSEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VAN AARSEN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 May 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Aug 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 May 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013