THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:55:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moussa (CPSO#: 101150 )
Business Address: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-853-3103
Fax: 905-853-2533

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket
HOSPITAL: Southlake Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Newmarket

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. M. Moussa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Mar 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Moussa (CPSO#: 101150 )
Business Address: 201-581 Davis Dr
Newmarket ON L3Y 2P6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA GEORGE MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MINA GEORGE MOUSSA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUSSA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Jul 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013