THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:44:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street, PO Box 1800
Mailbox #48
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727601
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mauli Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehta (CPSO#: 101151 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville hospital
381 Church St.
Markham ON L3P 7P3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, GUJARATI, HINDI
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Markham Stouffville Hospital
381 Church Street, PO Box 1800
Mailbox #48
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054727601
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 29 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 29 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mauli Mehta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Mehta (CPSO#: 101151 )
Business Address: Markham Stouffville hospital
381 Church St.
Markham ON L3P 7P3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAULI CHIRAGBHAI MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAULI CHIRAGBHAI MEHTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MEHTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013