THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/04/25 19:06:29 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott-Moncrieff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Feb 2025

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3045 Baseline Rd
Queensway Carleton Hospital
Nepean ON K2H 8P4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137212000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Ottawa Hospital
General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-8571
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cornwall Community Hospital Cornwall
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
Arnprior Regional Health Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barry's Bay
HOSPITAL: Cornwall Community Hospital
LOCATION: Cornwall

HOSPITAL: Renfrew Victoria Hospital
LOCATION: Renfrew

HOSPITAL: Arnprior Regional Health
LOCATION: Arnprior

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Almonte General Hospital
LOCATION: Almonte

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: St Francis Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Barry's Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Scott-Moncrieff Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Feb 2025

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW GRANT SCOTT-MONCRIEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT-MONCRIEFF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANDREW GRANT SCOTT-MONCRIEFF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SCOTT-MONCRIEFF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2013