THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 13:33:36 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River hospital
Hospitalist
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Hospitalist
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ellyas Omar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Omar (CPSO#: 101155 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327
Business Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 745-2273
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Grand River hospital
Hospitalist
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 749-4300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
Hospitalist
911 Queen's Blvd
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
Phone: (519) 744-3311
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Ellyas Omar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Omar (CPSO#: 101155 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300
Business Address: 385 Fairway Road South
Kitchener Ontario N2C 2N9
(519) 748-2327
Business Address: 751 Victoria Street South
Kitchener Ontario N2M 5N4
(519) 745-2273
Business Address: St. Mary's General Hospital
911 Queen's Boulevard
Kitchener Ontario N2M 1B2
(519) 744-3311

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ELLYAS OMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOHAMMAD ELLYAS OMAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OMAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013