THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:06:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-607 Gerrard St E
Broadon Clinic
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164617547
Fax: 4164617548
Address: 3rd-607 Gerrard St E
Broadon Clinic
Suite 301
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Phone: 4164617547
Fax: 4164617548
Address: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Phone: 416-966-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaiyan Su Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Su (CPSO#: 101156 )
Business Address: Eastdale Medical Clinic
997 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M4M 1Z4
(647) 348-6880
Business Address: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CHINESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 301-607 Gerrard St E
Broadon Clinic
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164617547
Fax: 4164617548
Address: 3rd-607 Gerrard St E
Broadon Clinic
Suite 301
Toronto ON M4M 1Y2
Phone: 4164617547
Fax: 4164617548
Address: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4
Phone: 416-966-2222
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 02 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kaiyan Su Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 27 Jan 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Su (CPSO#: 101156 )
Business Address: Eastdale Medical Clinic
997 Gerrard Street East
Toronto Ontario M4M 1Z4
(647) 348-6880
Business Address: 600 Sherbourne Street
Suite 202
Toronto Ontario M4X 1W4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAIYAN SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KAIYAN SU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013