THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:19:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital General
Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayoorendra Ravichandiran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ravichandiran (CPSO#: 101159 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, TAMIL
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Scarborough Hospital General
Campus
Department of Emergency Medicine
3030 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1P 2T7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Hospital Birchmount Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Hospital Birchmount
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mayoorendra Ravichandiran Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ravichandiran (CPSO#: 101159 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYOORENDRA RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYOORENDRA RAVICHANDIRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RAVICHANDIRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Apr 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Aug 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013