THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:39:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 College Street
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 4169282132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 16 Brookers lane, suite 2209
Toronto Ontario M8V 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDALL ULATE PIEDRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ulate Piedra (CPSO#: 101163 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
4164805340

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2075 Bayview Ave
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences
Toronto ON M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4762
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 340 College Street
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto Ontario M5T 3A9
Phone: 4169282132
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 16 Brookers lane, suite 2209
Toronto Ontario M8V 0A5
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 600-340 College St
Kensington Eye Institute
Toronto ON M5T 3A9
Phone: (416) 928-2132
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 01 Apr 2024
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 01 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RANDALL ULATE PIEDRA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 May 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Ulate Piedra (CPSO#: 101163 )
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
4164805340

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Apr 2024
31 Mar 2031
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 01 2024
EXPIRY DATE: Mar 31 2031
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RANDALL ULATE PIEDRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ULATE PIEDRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ULATE PIEDRA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ULATE PIEDRA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ULATE PIEDRA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 March, 2031.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. RANDALL ULATE PIEDRA may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Ophthalmology and Vision Sciences, University of Toronto, in which Dr. ULATE PIEDRA holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. ULATE PIEDRA no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. ULATE PIEDRA’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. ULATE PIEDRA’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 April, 2024. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 31 March, 2031.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Costa Rica, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 31 Mar 2031

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013