THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 04:14:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-742-2961
Fax: 416-742-0076
Address: 9080 Yonge St Level 2
Unite 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 57 Centre St, Thornhill
Thornhill Ontario L4J1G2
Phone: (905) 764-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asem Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saleh (CPSO#: 101175 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 605-1275 Finch Ave W
North York ON M3J 0L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-742-2961
Fax: 416-742-0076
Address: 9080 Yonge St Level 2
Unite 12
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: (289) 597-7676
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 57 Centre St, Thornhill
Thornhill Ontario L4J1G2
Phone: (905) 764-2384
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Vascular Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Vascular Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Asem Saleh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Saleh (CPSO#: 101175 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASEM SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASEM SALEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Oct 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013