THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 03:49:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 400
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-620-1685
Fax: 416-620-1755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. VENKAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Venkat (CPSO#: 101189 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Suite 312
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
416-620-1685
Business Address: 101 Queensway W
Suite 400
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
416-620-1685

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101 Queensway West
Suite 400
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-620-1685
Fax: 416-620-1755

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Urology
Effective: 17 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Urology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 17 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. S. VENKAT MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Venkat (CPSO#: 101189 )
Business Address: 89 Queensway W
Suite 312
Mississauga ON L5B 2V2
416-620-1685
Business Address: 101 Queensway W
Suite 400
Mississauga ON L5B 2P7
416-620-1685

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVA VENKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKAT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SIVA VENKAT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. VENKAT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Dec 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013