THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 20:04:39 PM

General Information

Former Name: Voicu, Laura (Used Until: 24 Jun 2015)
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4740 Dundas Street West
Westgrove Medical
Toronto Ontario M9A 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-368-8108
Fax: 647-345-3058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Laura & Garry Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Thomas (CPSO#: 101192 ) Dr. G. Thomas (CPSO#: 100768 )
Business Address: 2983 Bloor Street West
Westview Medical
Toronto Ontario M8X 1C1

General Information

Former Name: Voicu, Laura (Used Until: 24 Jun 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4740 Dundas Street West
Westgrove Medical
Toronto Ontario M9A 1A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-368-8108
Fax: 647-345-3058

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Drs. Laura & Garry Thomas Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. L. Thomas (CPSO#: 101192 ) Dr. G. Thomas (CPSO#: 100768 )
Business Address: 2983 Bloor Street West
Westview Medical
Toronto Ontario M8X 1C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAURA THOMAS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. THOMAS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013