THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:18:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Turi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Turi (CPSO#: 101198 )
Business Address: 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Address: 5863 Leslie St
North York ON M2H 1J8
647-479-9900
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Corporation Name: Turi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Humber River Hospital
1235 Wilson Ave
Toronto Ontario M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 242-1000
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 381 Church Street
Markham Stouffville Hospital
Markham Ontario L3P 7P3
Phone: 905-472-7373
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Internal Medicine
Effective: 26 Sep 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 26 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Turi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Turi (CPSO#: 101198 )
Business Address: 377 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 1A1
Business Address: 5863 Leslie St
North York ON M2H 1J8
647-479-9900
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2

Corporation Name: Turi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 11 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE JODY TURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GENEVIEVE JODY TURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rosalind Franklin University of Med.& Sc, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013