THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 03:58:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Rivest-Caissy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivest-Caissy (CPSO#: 101209 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Base Borden
31 Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
Borden Ontario L0M 1C0
(705) 424-1200
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
BCH
Anesthesia
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
9054942120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.P. Rivest-Caissy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Rivest-Caissy (CPSO#: 101209 )
Business Address: Canadian Forces Base Borden
31 Canadian Forces Health Services Centre
Borden Ontario L0M 1C0
(705) 424-1200
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
BCH
Anesthesia
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
9054942120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PATRICE JR. RIVEST-CAISSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST-CAISSY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JEAN-PATRICE JR. RIVEST-CAISSY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIVEST-CAISSY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013