THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I Karam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Karam (CPSO#: 101253 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing - 134
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4974

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 480-4974
Fax: (416) 480-6002

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Radiation Oncology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Radiation Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
Scarborough Health Network Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. I Karam Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Karam (CPSO#: 101253 )
Business Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Odette Cancer Centre
T-Wing - 134
2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(416) 480-4974

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE KARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IRENE KARAM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KARAM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013