THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 11:21:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1001 Peter Robertson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6R 2Y3
Phone: (905) 791-2449
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mohajer (CPSO#: 101263 ) Dr. H. Hamami (CPSO#: 113527 )
Business Address: 7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4M1
(905) 293-9663
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 77 Provost Drive
Toronto Ontario M2K 0B7
(416) 901-7407
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3C2
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1001 Peter Robertson Blvd
Brampton Ontario L6R 2Y3
Phone: (905) 791-2449
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 21 Oct 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 21 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mohajer Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Jun 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Mohajer (CPSO#: 101263 ) Dr. H. Hamami (CPSO#: 113527 )
Business Address: 7075 Rexwood Road
Mississauga Ontario L4T 4M1
(905) 293-9663
Business Address: 580 Harwood Avenue South
Ajax Ontario L1S 2J4
(905) 683-2320
Business Address: 77 Provost Drive
Toronto Ontario M2K 0B7
(416) 901-7407
Business Address: Suite 100
1333 Neilson Road
Scarborough Ontario M1B 3C2
(416) 291-7719
Business Address: 2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POUYA MOHAJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAJER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. POUYA MOHAJER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOHAJER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013