THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:56:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Level 4, Section V (Yellow)
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44621
Fax: 905-577-8022

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 23 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EUGENE MAIDA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maida (CPSO#: 101267 )
Business Address: Level 4 - Section V (Yellow)
1280 Main Street
McMaster University Medical Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5

Corporation Name: Eugene Maida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maida (CPSO#: 101267 )
Business Address: Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4462

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster University Medical Centre
1280 Main Street West
Level 4, Section V (Yellow)
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-521-2100
Extension: 44621
Fax: 905-577-8022

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pain Medicine
Effective: 23 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 23 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pain Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation Freeport Site
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre Regional Rehabilitation Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: EUGENE MAIDA MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Jan 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maida (CPSO#: 101267 )
Business Address: Level 4 - Section V (Yellow)
1280 Main Street
McMaster University Medical Centre
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5

Corporation Name: Eugene Maida Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Maida (CPSO#: 101267 )
Business Address: Michael G. DeGroote Pain Clinic
McMaster University Medical Centre
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3Z5
(905) 521-2100 Extn: 4462

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENE C MAIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EUGENE C MAIDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013