THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:43:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: R. G. Kar Medical College, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519 370 4066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurdeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Singh (CPSO#: 101271 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: R. G. Kar Medical College, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 470-3030
Fax: 519 370 4066

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gurdeep Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jul 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Singh (CPSO#: 101271 )
Business Address: Owen Sound Family Health Team
Suite 2000
1415 First Avenue West
Owen Sound Ontario N4K 4K8
(519) 470-3030

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GURDEEP SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: R. G. Kar Medical College, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013