THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1200
Fax: (519) 570-1214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aesthetics by Dr. Mallhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mallhi (CPSO#: 101272 )
Business Address: 10-1241 Strasburg Rd
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1
519 741 6780
Business Address: 440-1187 Fischer Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
519-741-6780

Corporation Name: H. Mallhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mallhi (CPSO#: 101272 )
Business Address: 1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
(519) 570-1200

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 570-1200
Fax: (519) 570-1214

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aesthetics by Dr. Mallhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mallhi (CPSO#: 101272 )
Business Address: 10-1241 Strasburg Rd
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1
519 741 6780
Business Address: 440-1187 Fischer Hallman Rd
Kitchener ON N2E 4H9
519-741-6780

Corporation Name: H. Mallhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Mallhi (CPSO#: 101272 )
Business Address: 1187 Fischer Hallman Road
Kitchener Ontario N2E 4H9
(519) 570-1200

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR MALLHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARKIRAN KAUR MALLHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MALLHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dayanand Medical College, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013