THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:42:55 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: COPPER CLIFF MEDICAL CLINIC
2 SERPENTINE STREET
Copper Cliff Ontario P0M1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-682-0300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NORTHWOOD MEDICAL CLINICS
2009 LONG LAKE RD
Sudbury Ontario P3E6C3
Phone: 705-522-3380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Ferroni-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferroni-Fortier (CPSO#: 101274 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: COPPER CLIFF MEDICAL CLINIC
2 SERPENTINE STREET
Copper Cliff Ontario P0M1N0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-682-0300
Fax: No Information Available
Address: NORTHWOOD MEDICAL CLINICS
2009 LONG LAKE RD
Sudbury Ontario P3E6C3
Phone: 705-522-3380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Sandra Ferroni-Fortier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Apr 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Ferroni-Fortier (CPSO#: 101274 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA LYN FERRONI-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRONI-FORTIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SANDRA LYN FERRONI-FORTIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FERRONI-FORTIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northern Ontario School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Oct 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013