THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:03:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Wood District Hospital
21 Sylvan St W
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine A. Murray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray (CPSO#: 101281 )
Business Address: Lake of the Wood District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861 Extn: 2201

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Lake of the Wood District Hospital
21 Sylvan St W
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 468-9861
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
HOSPITAL: Lake of the Woods District Hospital
LOCATION: Kenora

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Catherine A. Murray Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Murray (CPSO#: 101281 )
Business Address: Lake of the Wood District Hospital
21 Sylvan Street West
Kenora Ontario P9N 3W7
(807) 468-9861 Extn: 2201

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE ALEXANDRA MURRAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MURRAY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013