THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 07:04:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 56595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Josse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Josse (CPSO#: 101283 )
Business Address: 17-175 West Beaver Creek Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaird Dr E
Brampton Civic Hospital
Brampton ON L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Extension: 56595
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: William Osler Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jonathan Josse Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Josse (CPSO#: 101283 )
Business Address: 17-175 West Beaver Creek Rd
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3M1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL JOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSSE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JONATHAN MICHAEL JOSSE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JOSSE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013