THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:24:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Big Thunder Orthopedics
984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073441123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riediger (CPSO#: 101302 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Rd
Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
8073341123

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2023

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Big Thunder Orthopedics
984 Oliver Road
Suite 206
Thunder Bay
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 7C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8073441123
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Riediger (CPSO#: 101302 )
Business Address: 984 Oliver Rd
Suite 206
Thunder Bay ON P7B 7C7
8073341123

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 09 May 2023

Corporation Name: Michael D. Riediger Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Oct 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID RIEDIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEDIGER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL DAVID RIEDIGER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. RIEDIGER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University College, Cork, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013