THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:53:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1615 Dundas St E
Suite 402 - West Tower
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-231-3285
Fax: 1-855-640-3811

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAYNA AMTING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Amting (CPSO#: 101309 )
Business Address: 1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON L1N 2L1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1615 Dundas St E
Suite 402 - West Tower
Whitby ON L1N 2L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-231-3285
Fax: 1-855-640-3811

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 17 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site Oshawa
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Oshawa General Site
LOCATION: Oshawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JAYNA AMTING MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 02 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Amting (CPSO#: 101309 )
Business Address: 1615 Dundas St E
Whitby ON L1N 2L1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAYNA MAUREEN AMTING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMTING is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JAYNA MAUREEN AMTING may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMTING is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013