THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:08:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Family Health Group
P7A 4Z6
470-63N Algoma St
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryanne Minty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Minty (CPSO#: 101316 )
Business Address: Suite 470
4th Floor
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 633-1853

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Superior Family Health Group
P7A 4Z6
470-63N Algoma St
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 344-8475
Fax: (807) 344-6323

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bryanne Minty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Minty (CPSO#: 101316 )
Business Address: Suite 470
4th Floor
63 Algoma Street North
Thunder Bay Ontario P7A 4Z6
(807) 633-1853

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYANNE MINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BRYANNE MINTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MINTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Manitoba, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013