THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 21:42:24 PM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Pune, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Extension: 6312
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burute Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Burute (CPSO#: 101344 ) Dr. P. Krishnan (CPSO#: 98956 )
Business Address: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 20B Cartier Road
Box 370
Terrace Bay Ontario P0T 2W0
(807) 825-3273
Business Address: 26 Peninsula Road
Box 780
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-1740
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-3026
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Pune, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6000
Extension: 6312
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 25 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 25 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Women's College Hospital Toronto
University Health Network Toronto
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
Nipigon District Memorial Hospital Nipigon
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Women's College Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Nipigon District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Nipigon

HOSPITAL: Dryden Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Dryden

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Burute Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Aug 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Burute (CPSO#: 101344 ) Dr. P. Krishnan (CPSO#: 98956 )
Business Address: 58 Goodall Street
Dryden Ontario P8N 2Z6
(807) 223-8200
Business Address: 20B Cartier Road
Box 370
Terrace Bay Ontario P0T 2W0
(807) 825-3273
Business Address: 26 Peninsula Road
Box 780
Marathon Ontario P0T 2E0
(807) 229-1740
Business Address: 125 Hogan Road
Nipigon Ontario P0T 2J0
(807) 887-3026
Business Address: Thunder Bay Regional Health
Sciences Center
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
25 Nov 2022
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 25 2022
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NISHIGANDHA PRABHAKAR BURUTE may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. NISHIGANDHA PRABHAKAR BURUTE may practise medicine independently in diagnostic radiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Pune, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Nov 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013