THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:10:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Pediatric Clinic
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193781460
Fax: 5193781461
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Pediatrics Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto, ON M4C 3E7
Toronto Ontario N5A 2N4
Phone: 416-469-6487
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davidson (CPSO#: 101354 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Annan Ontario N0H 1B0

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1800 8th St E
Pediatric Clinic
Owen Sound ON N4K 6M9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5193781460
Fax: 5193781461
Address: Michael Garron Hospital
Pediatrics Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto, ON M4C 3E7
Toronto Ontario N5A 2N4
Phone: 416-469-6487
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound Owen Sound
HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Owen Sound
LOCATION: Owen Sound

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Davidson (CPSO#: 101354 )
Business Address: 1800 8th Street East
Annan Ontario N0H 1B0

Corporation Name: Dr. Chloe Davidson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 14 Apr 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN CHLOE MCINNES DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ELLEN CHLOE MCINNES DAVIDSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVIDSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013