THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:54:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-1241 Strasburg Rd
1241 Strasburg Road, Unit 4
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-742-4321
Fax: 519-742-1305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fareeha Ahmad Qayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Qayyum (CPSO#: 101359 )
Business Address: 4-1241 Strasburg Rd
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1

Corporation Name: Dr. Fareeha Ahmad Qayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4-1241 Strasburg Rd
1241 Strasburg Road, Unit 4
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-742-4321
Fax: 519-742-1305

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 23 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Fareeha Ahmad Qayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Jun 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Qayyum (CPSO#: 101359 )
Business Address: 4-1241 Strasburg Rd
Kitchener ON N2R 0S1

Corporation Name: Dr. Fareeha Ahmad Qayyum Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAREEHA AHMAD QAYYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAYYUM is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FAREEHA AHMAD QAYYUM may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. QAYYUM is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013