THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:04:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7S - Integrated Stroke Unit
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46311
Fax: 8555938993
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. SYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Syed (CPSO#: 101361 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 7S - Integrated Stroke Unit
Hamilton General Hospital
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 46311
Fax: 8555938993
Address: Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford Ontario N3R 1G9
Phone: 519-751-5525
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
Brant Community Healthcare System Brantford
HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Brant Community Healthcare System
LOCATION: Brantford

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. N. SYED MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Jul 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Syed (CPSO#: 101361 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABEEL MUHAMMAD SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NABEEL MUHAMMAD SYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013