THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:24:57 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-353 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-7557
Fax: 613-212-8893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Brophy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Brophy (CPSO#: 101387 )
Business Address: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
6133667557

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 107-353 Montreal Rd
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-366-7557
Fax: 613-212-8893

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Jul 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin Brophy Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Brophy (CPSO#: 101387 )
Business Address: 353 Montreal Rd
Unit 107
Vanier ON K1L 6B1
6133667557

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JAMES BROPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROPHY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KEVIN JAMES BROPHY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BROPHY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Toronto, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013