THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:21:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-595-6019
Fax: 416-595-6821
Address: 119 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1P2
Phone: (416) 962-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Notta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Notta (CPSO#: 101392 )
Business Address: 100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Notta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-595-6019
Fax: 416-595-6821
Address: 119 Isabella Street
Toronto Ontario M4Y 1P2
Phone: (416) 962-7600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Casey House Toronto
Centre for Addiction & Mental Health Toronto
HOSPITAL: Casey House
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Centre for Addiction & Mental Health
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Notta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Mar 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Notta (CPSO#: 101392 )
Business Address: 100 Stokes Street
Toronto Ontario M6J 1H4

Corporation Name: Notta Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 May 2023

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIA NOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIA NOTTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOTTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013