THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:56:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3446 Dundas St W
The Four Villages CHC
York ON M6S 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-604-3362
Fax: 416-604-3365
Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Phone: 4168556210
Fax: 4162189884
Address: 30 The Queensway
St-Joseph's Health Centre
Primary Practice Obstetrics
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4549
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moukheiber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moukheiber (CPSO#: 101401 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
S-Joseph's Health Center
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Street
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0S2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 96 Roncesvalles Ave
Asāla Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M6R 2K8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC, SPANISH
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3446 Dundas St W
The Four Villages CHC
York ON M6S 2S1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-604-3362
Fax: 416-604-3365
Address: 96 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 2K8
Phone: 4168556210
Fax: 4162189884
Address: 30 The Queensway
St-Joseph's Health Centre
Primary Practice Obstetrics
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Phone: 416-530-6000
Extension: 4549
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto Toronto
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Health Centre Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Moukheiber Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Moukheiber (CPSO#: 101401 )
Business Address: 30 The Queensway
S-Joseph's Health Center
Toronto ON M6R 1B5
Business Address: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Street
Ottawa Ontario K1A 0S2
(613) 746-4621
Business Address: 96 Roncesvalles Ave
Asāla Medical Clinic
Toronto ON M6R 2K8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMA SHIRINE MOUKHEIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUKHEIBER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DIMA SHIRINE MOUKHEIBER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MOUKHEIBER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013