THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:11:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 409
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-9592
Fax: (416) 297-7552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Shew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shew (CPSO#: 101405 )
Business Address: 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-9592

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CANTONESE, MANDARIN
Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4040 Finch Avenue East
Suite 409
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 297-9592
Fax: (416) 297-7552

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Scarborough Health Network Centenary Toronto
HOSPITAL: Scarborough Health Network Centenary
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark Shew Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Jan 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Shew (CPSO#: 101405 )
Business Address: 409 - 4040 Finch Avenue East
Scarborough Ontario M1S 4V5
(416) 297-9592

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK SHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEW is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARK SHEW may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHEW is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Wayne State University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013