THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:22:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 213
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-827-5658
Fax: 905-827-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amina Lodhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lodhi (CPSO#: 101424 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Oakville Medical Centre
Suite 213
3075 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 1M1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-827-5658
Fax: 905-827-5856

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 31 Dec 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 31 Dec 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 31 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences General Site Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences General Site
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amina Lodhi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Lodhi (CPSO#: 101424 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 May 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 24 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amina Lodhi may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
rheumatology.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Amina Lodhi may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and
rheumatology.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fatima Jinnah Medical College, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 May 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 May 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013