THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:07:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 740 8321
Fax: 705 876 5172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tomkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tomkinson (CPSO#: 101426 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough Regional Health Centre
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705 740 8321
Fax: 705 876 5172

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Peterborough Regional Health Centre Peterborough
HOSPITAL: Peterborough Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: Peterborough

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. Tomkinson Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Aug 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Tomkinson (CPSO#: 101426 )
Business Address: 1 Hospital Dr
Peterborough ON K9J 7C6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE BARBARA TOMKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMKINSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHRISTINE BARBARA TOMKINSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOMKINSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Limerick School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 May 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013