THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:23:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2830 Keele St.
Unit 302
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-638-7269
Fax: 416-638-7455
Address: Villa Colombo Nursing Home
40 Playfair Ave.
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
Phone: 416-789-2113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Battista Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Battista (CPSO#: 101437 )
Business Address: 302-2830 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
(416) 638-7269
Business Address: Villa Colombo Nursing Home
40 Playfair Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
(416) 789-2113

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ITALIAN
Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2830 Keele St.
Unit 302
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-638-7269
Fax: 416-638-7455
Address: Villa Colombo Nursing Home
40 Playfair Ave.
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
Phone: 416-789-2113
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Robert Battista Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Battista (CPSO#: 101437 )
Business Address: 302-2830 Keele Street
Toronto Ontario M3M 3E5
(416) 638-7269
Business Address: Villa Colombo Nursing Home
40 Playfair Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6B 2P9
(416) 789-2113

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANGELO BATTISTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTISTA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ROBERT ANGELO BATTISTA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BATTISTA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Thomas Jefferson University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013