THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 04:54:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C Victoria Hospital
Division of Neonatal and Perinatal
Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lalitha Kumari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lalitha Kumari (CPSO#: 101453 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 64108

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: L H S C Victoria Hospital
Division of Neonatal and Perinatal
Medicine
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Aug 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lalitha Kumari Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Mar 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Lalitha Kumari (CPSO#: 101453 )
Business Address: 800 Commissioners Rd East
London ON N6A 5W9
5196858500 Extn: 64108

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Dec 2022
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Dec 22 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Renjini Lalitha Kumari may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Lalitha
Kumari holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Lalitha Kumari no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Lalitha Kumari's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Lalitha Kumari's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Lalitha Kumari's academic appointment at the
University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Renjini Lalitha Kumari may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. Lalitha
Kumari holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant
Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Lalitha Kumari no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Lalitha Kumari's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Lalitha Kumari's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on August 1, 2020, and expires on June 30,
2026. Upon renewal of Dr. Lalitha Kumari's academic appointment at the
University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013