THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:01:35 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kaufman, Amber Jean (Used Until: 25 May 2016)
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-8833
Fax: 905-637-6745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amber Jackman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jackman (CPSO#: 101470 )
Business Address: Birchtree Family Medicine
203 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 637-8833

General Information

Former Name: Kaufman, Amber Jean (Used Until: 25 May 2016)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 203
3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 637-8833
Fax: 905-637-6745

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Amber Jackman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Nov 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Jackman (CPSO#: 101470 )
Business Address: Birchtree Family Medicine
203 - 3155 Harvester Road
Burlington Ontario L7N 3V2
(905) 637-8833

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER JEAN JACKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMBER JEAN JACKMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JACKMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013