THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:18:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fred A. Litwin Family Centre
In Genetic Medicine
60 Murray St
Box# 34 Room 400
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: 416-619-5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Nimmo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nimmo (CPSO#: 101473 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Fred A. Litwin Family Centre In Genetic Medicine
Room 400
Toronto ON M5T 3L9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Fred A. Litwin Family Centre
In Genetic Medicine
60 Murray St
Box# 34 Room 400
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-586-4800
Extension: 4220
Fax: 416-619-5523

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Medical Genetics and Genomics
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Medical Genetics and Genomics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Graeme Nimmo Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Nimmo (CPSO#: 101473 )
Business Address: 60 Murray St
Fred A. Litwin Family Centre In Genetic Medicine
Room 400
Toronto ON M5T 3L9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME ARCHIBALD MCLEAS NIMMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMMO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GRAEME ARCHIBALD MCLEAS NIMMO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIMMO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013