THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:58:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1996
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44760
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Amit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Amit (CPSO#: 101477 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HEBREW
Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Hamilton General Hospital
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 44760
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Aug 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Israel

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Guy Amit Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Mar 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Amit (CPSO#: 101477 )
Business Address: Hamilton Health Sciences
Division of Cardiology
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8L 2X2
(905) 521-2100

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Aug 2019
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Guy Amit may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Guy Amit may practise medicine independently in cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: The Hebrew University-Hadassah Medical School, 1996

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Dec 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013