THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 03:01:09 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: China Medical University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dongning Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wu (CPSO#: 101478 )
Business Address: One Care Medical Clinic
Department of Paediatrics
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
(416) 290-0361

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, MANDARIN
Medical School: China Medical University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: One Care Medical Clinic
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 290-0361
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Dongning Wu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Aug 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Wu (CPSO#: 101478 )
Business Address: One Care Medical Clinic
Department of Paediatrics
1755 Brimley Road
Toronto Ontario M1P 0A3
(416) 290-0361

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONGNING WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DONGNING WU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: China Medical University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Aug 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2013