THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:07:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Neonatology
Room D4-212
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhattacharya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhattacharya (CPSO#: 101489 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital
Department of Neonatology
Room D4-212
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 64105

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC Children's Hospital
Department of Neonatology
Room D4-212
800 Commissioners Rd E
London Ontario N6A 5W9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 685-8500
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
India

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
HOSPITAL: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital of Western Ontario
LOCATION: London

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Bhattacharya Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Bhattacharya (CPSO#: 101489 )
Business Address: London Health Sciences Centre Children's Hospital
Department of Neonatology
Room D4-212
800 Commissioners Road East
London Ontario N6A 5W9
(519) 685-8500 Extn: 64105

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
29 Apr 2020
30 Jun 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 29 2020
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Soume Bhattacharya may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine, University of
Western Ontario, in which Dr. Bhattacharya holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Bhattacharya no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Bhattacharya's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Bhattacharya's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2018, and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Bhattacharya's academic appointment at the
University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Soume Bhattacharya may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Paediatrics, Division of Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine, University of
Western Ontario, in which Dr. Bhattacharya holds an academic
appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Bhattacharya no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Bhattacharya's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Bhattacharya's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on January 1, 2018, and expires on June 30,
2025. Upon renewal of Dr. Bhattacharya's academic appointment at the
University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject
to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Calcutta National Medical College, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013