THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:12:27 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204A
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-320-7707
Fax: 705-702-4799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. El-Beheiry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Beheiry (CPSO#: 101521 )
Business Address: Suite 204
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
705-320-7707
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6191

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 204A
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-320-7707
Fax: 705-702-4799

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M.H. El-Beheiry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. M. El-Beheiry (CPSO#: 101521 )
Business Address: Suite 204
86 Angeline Street South
Lindsay Ontario K9V 3L5
705-320-7707
Business Address: Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6191

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA HOSSAM EL-BEHEIRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BEHEIRY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOSTAFA HOSSAM EL-BEHEIRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. EL-BEHEIRY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013