THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:40:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076243400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dama (CPSO#: 101528 )
Business Address: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 8076243400
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 525 Simpson Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7C 3J6
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 14 May 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 14 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Care Group Thunder Bay
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Dama Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 May 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Dama (CPSO#: 101528 )
Business Address: 710 Victoria Ave E
Thunder Bay ON P7C 5P7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMEET DAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SUMEET DAMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Kasturba Medical College, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jul 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013