THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:05:39 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Physiatry
302-345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Rehab Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ida J Cavaliere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cavaliere (CPSO#: 101539 )
Business Address: 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Unit 302
Oakville ON L6J 1J5
9058422888
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Oakville Physiatry
302-345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville Ontario L6J 1J5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 842-2888
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100 Queensway W
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
Rehab Medicine
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8
Phone: (905) 848-7100
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste. Marie Ontario P6B 0A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners Queensway Health Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Ida J Cavaliere Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Cavaliere (CPSO#: 101539 )
Business Address: 345 Lakeshore Rd E
Unit 302
Oakville ON L6J 1J5
9058422888
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IDA JACQUELINE CAVALIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAVALIERE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IDA JACQUELINE CAVALIERE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAVALIERE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013