THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:39:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-27 Place d'Armes
Galen Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7K 6Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: ‭(613) 507-4800‬
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Galen Eye Centre, 27 Place d'Armes, Kingston, ON, K7K 6Z6
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 101571 )
Business Address: 100-27 Place d'Armes
Galen Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7K 6Z6

Corporation Name: H. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 100-27 Place d'Armes
Galen Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7K 6Z6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: ‭(613) 507-4800‬
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Galen Eye Centre, 27 Place d'Armes, Kingston, ON, K7K 6Z6
Date Received: 31 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Quebec

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Hotel Dieu Hospital Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Hotel Dieu Hospital
LOCATION: Kingston

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: H. SINGH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Singh (CPSO#: 101571 )
Business Address: 100-27 Place d'Armes
Galen Eye Centre
Kingston ON K7K 6Z6

Corporation Name: H. Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 18 May 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARMANJIT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HARMANJIT SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2019
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Aug 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2013