THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 06:10:54 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 389-2929
Fax: (905) 389-1414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Jun 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abiodun Oyebola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oyebola (CPSO#: 101608 )
Business Address: 202-849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 389-2929

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite 202
849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 389-2929
Fax: (905) 389-1414

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 27 Jun 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 27 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Abiodun Oyebola Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Oyebola (CPSO#: 101608 )
Business Address: 202-849 Upper Wentworth Street
Hamilton Ontario L9A 5H4
(905) 389-2929

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Apr 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Apr 09 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abiodun Ayodeji Oyebola may practise medicine independently in paediatrics
in an office based setting, only.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Abiodun Ayodeji Oyebola may practise medicine independently in paediatrics
in an office based setting, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 09 Apr 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 09 Apr 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2013