THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:09:43 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Grant Medical College, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Nephrology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75635
Fax: 905-308-7548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahul Chanchlani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chanchlani (CPSO#: 101627 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: Grant Medical College, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: McMaster Children's Hospital
Division of Pediatric Nephrology
1280 Main St W
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 521-2100
Extension: 75635
Fax: 905-308-7548

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 22 Apr 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 22 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

HOSPITAL: Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster Children's Hospital
LOCATION: Hamilton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rahul Chanchlani Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Dec 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Chanchlani (CPSO#: 101627 )
Business Address: McMaster Children's Hospital
Department of Paediatrics
1280 Main Street West
Hamilton Ontario L8S 4K1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
27 Oct 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Oct 27 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAHUL CHANCHLANI may practise medicine independently in pediatric nephrology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. RAHUL CHANCHLANI may practise medicine independently in pediatric nephrology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Grant Medical College, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 01 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Jun 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Aug 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013