THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:41:01 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 326-865 Regent St
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7100
Extension: 7257
Fax: 705-523-7267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Main Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Main (CPSO#: 101633 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
705-523-7257

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 326-865 Regent St
Sudbury ON P3E 3Y9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-523-7100
Extension: 7257
Fax: 705-523-7267

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 18 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 18 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 01 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
USA - Ohio

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Health Sciences North Sudbury
HOSPITAL: Health Sciences North
LOCATION: Sudbury

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Anthony Main Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Main (CPSO#: 101633 )
Business Address: 865 Regent Street
Greater Sudbury Ontario P3E 3Y9
705-523-7257

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ELGIN MAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANTHONY ELGIN MAIN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAIN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 27 Aug 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 27 Aug 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2013