THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:52:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-396-4300
Fax: 866-588-4130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciszkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ciszkowski (CPSO#: 101647 )
Business Address: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6752

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-396-4300
Fax: 866-588-4130

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 22 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 22 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
South Bruce Grey Health Centre Walkerton
HOSPITAL: South Bruce Grey Health Centre
LOCATION: Walkerton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ciszkowski Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Ciszkowski (CPSO#: 101647 )
Business Address: 1201 Queen Street
Kincardine Ontario N2Z 3C1
(519) 396-6752

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE CISZKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CISZKOWSKI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE CISZKOWSKI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CISZKOWSKI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013