THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:52:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: 613-830-2170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Khougaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khougaz (CPSO#: 101648 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Orléans Ontario K1C 1S6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 830-1298
Fax: 613-830-2170

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 21 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 21 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Khougaz Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 16 Dec 2016
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Khougaz (CPSO#: 101648 )
Business Address: St. Joseph Family Medicine Clinic
104-2555 St. Joseph Boulevard
Ottawa Ontario K1C 1S6
(613) 830-1298

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSEL KHOUGAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOUGAZ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BASSEL KHOUGAZ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHOUGAZ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Université de Montréal Faculté de Médecine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Oct 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2013